blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1000735

EP1000735 - Filling apparatus of axial powder presses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dorst Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Mittenwalder Strasse 61
82431 Kochel / DE
[2004/35]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Dorst-Maschinen- und Anlagenbau GmbH & Co.
Mittenwalder Strasse 61
D-82431 Kochel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wolfrom, Walter
Rottmannweg 4
82335 Assenhausen / DE
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Schulze, Mark
Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze
Patentanwälte
Dietramszeller Str. 22
83624 Otterfing / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/49]Schulze, Mark
M Schulze IPR Consulting Pilotystrasse 4
80538 München / DE
Former [2005/04]Leibbrand, Heike
Rechtsanwältin, Kanzlei Leibbrand - Thiele, Isoldenstrasse 8
80804 München / DE
Former [2002/19]Hemmerling, Marion
Kanzlei Leibbrand - Thiele, Isoldenstrasse 8
80804 München / DE
Former [2000/20]Hemmerling, Marion
Kanzlei Maute, Am Flosskanal 7
82515 Wolfratshausen / DE
Application number, filing date99121951.009.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateDE1998105152709.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851527
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1000735
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1000735
Date:27.03.2002
[2002/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000735
Date:03.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:B30B15/30, // B28B13/02, B22F3/00
[2002/13]
CPC:
B28B13/023 (EP,US); B30B15/304 (EP,US); B22F2998/00 (EP,US)
C-Set:
B22F2998/00, B22F3/004 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/20]B30B15/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [2002/51]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Füllvorrichtung für axiale Pulverpressen[2000/20]
English:Filling apparatus of axial powder presses[2000/20]
French:Dispositif de remplissage dans des presses axiales pour poudre[2000/20]
Examination procedure20.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
28.09.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.01.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
19.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2006Fee for grant paid
24.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
17.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.11.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB736551  (BRITISH INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS) [Y] 10* claim 1 *;
 [DA]EP0399281  (GRAEBENER THEODOR PRESSENSYST [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 44; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [XY]US5733588  (CHATTERJEE DILIP K [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 44; figure 1; claim 1 * * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 10
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.