Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
16.11.2001 | Renewal fee | |
18.10.2001 | Change - extension states | |
12.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
21.06.2001 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
21.06.2001 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
15.06.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] |
29.09.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |