Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
31.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
22.09.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
22.09.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
25.08.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.06.2004 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.06.2004 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.05.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
27.11.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.09.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
29.11.2002 | Renewal fee | |
07.12.2001 | Renewal fee | |
20.04.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] |