EP1006732 - Motion compensated interpolation for digital video signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sun, Huifang 61 Kinglet Drive South Cranbury, New Jersey, 08572 / US | 02 /
Vetro, Anthony 113 Regis Drive Staten Island, New York, 10314 / US | 03 /
Kung, Sun-Yuan 257 Dodds Lane Princeton, New Jersey, 08540 / US | 04 /
Chen, Yen-Kuang 16 Cabot Way Franklin Park, New Jersey, 08823 / US | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/23] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122226.6 | 08.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | US19980206032 | 04.12.1998 Original published format: US 206032 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1006732 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1006732 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/46 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
H04N19/577 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/29] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bewegungskompensierte Interpolation für digitalen Videosignalverarbeitung | [2000/23] | English: | Motion compensated interpolation for digital video signal processing | [2000/23] | French: | Interpolation avec compensation de mouvement en traitement de signal vidéo numérique | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/07] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4383272 (NETRAVALI ARUN N, et al) [X] 5 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 22; figure 2 * [Y] 1-4,6-13; | [A]EP0863674 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 55, line 55 - page 57, line 27; figure 5; table 5 *; | [XY] - YEN-KUANG CHEN ET AL, "A feature tracking algorithm using neighborhood relaxation with multi-candidate pre-screening", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP) LAUSANNE, SEPT. 16 - 19, 1996, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19960916), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3259-8, pages 513 - 516, XP010202707 [X] 14 * page 513, column L, paragraph 2 - page 514, column R, paragraph L; figure 1 * [Y] 1-4,6-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1996.560904 | [A] - VANDENDORPE L ET AL, "MOTION-COMPENSATED CONVERSION FROM INTERLACED TO PROGRESSIVE FORMATS", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940601), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 193 - 211, XP000451925 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 198 - 200, section 3.2 *; page 202, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 203, column R, line 18 - line 34 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(94)90025-6 | [PXA] - YEN-KUANG CHEN ET AL, "Frame-rate up-conversion using transmitted true motion vectors", MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998 IEEE SECOND WORKSHOP ON REDONDO BEACH, CA, USA 7-9 DEC. 1998, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19981207), ISBN 0-7803-4919-9, pages 622 - 627, XP010318331 [PX] 1,2,5,6 * page 622, paragraph 2 - page 625, line 21 * [A] 3,4,7-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMSP.1998.739050 |