EP1003356 - Discharge lamp lighting apparatus and manufacturing method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuchi, Hiroaki, c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Hiramatsu, Hiromi, c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Horii, Yasutoshi, c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Noboru, c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref 448-8661 / JP | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122230.8 | 08.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | JP19980331293 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33129398 | JP19980367412 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36741298 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1003356 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1003356 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003356 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/04, H05B41/38 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
H05B41/2881 (EP,US);
H05B41/042 (EP,US);
H05B41/382 (EP,US);
H05B41/384 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/30] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Zünden einer Entladungslampe und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2000/21] | English: | Discharge lamp lighting apparatus and manufacturing method therefor | [2000/21] | French: | Appareil pour l'amorçage de lampes à décharge et méthode de fabrication d' un tel appareil | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 09.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03024888.4 / EP1399004 | EP06121530.7 / EP1744601 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0855851 (TOYO DENSO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-15,17,18,20 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19521070 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 7,8 * figures 11,13,15 *; | [A]US5475358 (KOTANI HIROKAZA [JP], et al) [A] * figures 1,4 *; | [Y]DE19710691 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 21-25 * figure - *; | [A]WO9849488 (JRS TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [A]DE29615609U (NIGGEMEYER GERT GUENTHER [DE], et al); | [Y]EP0587183 (FISCHER & PORTER CANADA [CA]) [Y] 21-25 * figure - * |