EP1004400 - Method for polishing a notch of a wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2001 [2001/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SpeedFam- IPEC Co., Ltd. 2647 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa-ken 252-1123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states SpeedFam- IPEC Co., Ltd. 2647 Hayakawa Ayase-shi, Kanagawa-ken 252-1123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakomori, Shunji SpeedFam-IPEC Co.,Ltd., 2647, Hayakawa Ayase-shi, Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122257.1 | 08.11.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | JP19980337700 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33770098 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1004400 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/06 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
B24B37/345 (EP);
B24B9/00 (KR);
B24B9/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/07] |
Former [2000/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Polieren der Einschittteil einer Halbleiterscheibe | [2000/22] | English: | Method for polishing a notch of a wafer | [2000/22] | French: | Procédé de polissage pour l'encoche d'une plaquette semi-conductrice | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/44] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0764976 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 1; figure - *; | [Y]EP0629470 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 1; figure - *; | [A]DE4325518 (WACKER CHEMITRONIC [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 42 - line 45 *; | [A]EP0633097 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |