Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
14.05.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.12.2003 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.12.2003 | First examination report | |
03.12.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.12.2002 | Renewal fee | |
05.12.2001 | Renewal fee | |
15.02.2001 | Change - extension states | |
22.12.2000 | Definitive list of designations | published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] |
10.11.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
07.04.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |