Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
09.01.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] |
18.12.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
18.12.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
06.11.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.08.2003 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
18.12.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
04.12.2002 | Renewal fee | |
30.08.2002 | First examination report | |
28.08.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
22.05.2002 | Change - extension states | |
25.01.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] |
26.10.2001 | Renewal fee | |
15.06.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] |
05.05.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] |
04.05.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] |