Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000185576 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19858294 | 17.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1010567 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2004 | B1 | EP1010567 | 20.06.2001 | A3 | EP1010567 | 21.06.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19858294 | 17.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19858294 | 02.11.2000 | C2 | DE19858294 | 06.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19858294 | 17.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6266604 | 24.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19858294 | 17.12.1998 |