EP1010567 - Method for controlling vehicle cruise speed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linden, Thomas Mäulenstrasse 24 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/25] | Application number, filing date | 99122601.0 | 13.11.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | DE1998158294 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858294 | [2000/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1010567 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1010567 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1010567 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/04 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
B60K31/04 (EP,US);
B60W2540/16 (EP,US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/11] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fahrgeschwindigkeitsregelung eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [2000/25] | English: | Method for controlling vehicle cruise speed | [2000/25] | French: | Méthode pour la régulation de la vitesse d'un véhicule | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19509492 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 11, line 33 - line 39 *; | [A]US5382206 (ODA KYOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - line 49 *; | [A]DE3523352 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4443219 | DE19508492 | WO9302885 |