EP1013947 - Fastener device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITW Automotive Products GmbH & Co. KG Liegnitzer Strasse 1 58842 Iserlohn / DE | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jakob, Andreas In den Weiden 3 b 58675 Hemer / DE | 02 /
Kappel, Hubert Zollernstrasse 13 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122645.7 | 13.11.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE1998222392U | 16.12.1998 Original published format: DE 29822392 U | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013947 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/36 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
F16B39/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung | [2000/26] | English: | Fastener device | [2000/26] | French: | Dispositif de fixation | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/16] | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2449846 (GILMAN D.M.) [X] 1-4,9,12-17 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 34; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US1720799 (MCLAUGHLIN MILTON P) [X] 1-4,11-17 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1172678 (DYSON & SONS INC.) [X] 1-4,7,8,12-15 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0065414 (HARD LOCK KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAIS) [A] 5-7 * column 2, lines 29-31; figures 1-10 * |