EP1029503 - Adhesive dressing for stain removal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehm, Hans-Georg, Dr. rer. nat. Kellergrundweg 13 D-61476 Kronberg/Ts / DE | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/34] | Application number, filing date | 99122681.2 | 15.11.1999 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | DE1999106412 | 16.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19906412 | [2000/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1029503 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1029503 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029503 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47L25/08, C11D17/04 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
D06L1/04 (EP);
C11D17/041 (EP);
D06L1/01 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | A47L25/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | Heftpflaster zur Fleckentfernung | [2000/34] | English: | Adhesive dressing for stain removal | [2000/34] | French: | Pansement adhesif pour l'élimination de taches | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 25.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.08.2005 | FR | 10.08.2005 | GB | 10.08.2005 | IE | 10.08.2005 | IT | 10.08.2005 | NL | 10.08.2005 | DK | 10.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | SE | 10.11.2005 | AT | 15.11.2005 | CY | 15.11.2005 | ES | 21.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | PT | 10.01.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/17] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
GB | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
IT | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
AT | 15.11.2005 | ||
CY | 15.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
GB | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
AT | 15.11.2005 | ||
CY | 15.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
GB | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
CY | 15.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
GB | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
GB | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
GB | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
SE | 10.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [T]JPH09137375 ; | [A]US3334374 (WATKINS JR NATHANIEL L) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 10 - column 1, line 70; figure . *; | [A]US4214592 (JACQUET PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]DE4001034 (LANDAU EBERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 22 - line 25 * * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 17; figures 1-3 * | [T] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09137375 A 19970527 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [T] 1-4 * abstract * |