Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3425691B | Global Dossier | 14.07.2003 | B2 | JP2000177515 | 27.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19858298 | 17.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1014108 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19858298 | 17.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19858298 | 31.05.2001 | C2 | DE19858298 | 29.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19858298 | 17.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6300896 | 09.10.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19858298 | 17.12.1998 |