EP1014108 - Use of a device in a road vehicle, with which the surroundings of the vehicle can be recognized by means of radar radiations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kull, Wolfgang Adenauerstrasse 79 73765 Neuhausen / DE | 02 /
Lauer, Wolfgang Solothurner Strasse 31 74074 Heilbronn / DE | 03 /
Reichmann, Thomas Dr.-Frey-Strasse 26 73072 Donzdorf / DE | [2000/26] | Application number, filing date | 99122740.6 | 16.11.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE1998158298 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858298 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014108 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/92, G01S13/93 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S13/60 (EP,US);
G01S13/92 (EP,US);
G01S2013/932 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9321 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9325 (EP,US);
G01S7/4091 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Einrichtung in einem Fahrzeug, mit der die Umgebung des Fahrzeuges mittels Radarstrahlen erkannt werden kann | [2000/26] | English: | Use of a device in a road vehicle, with which the surroundings of the vehicle can be recognized by means of radar radiations | [2000/26] | French: | Utilisation d'un dispositif dans un véhicule routier, grâce auquel l'environnement du véhicule peut être reconnu au moyen de rayonnements radar | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 11.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0848198 ; | [A]DE2623643 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1-3 * page 9, line 30 - page 20, line 31; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4335382 (BROWN BRYCE K, et al) [A] 1-3,10,11 * column A * * column 3, line 13 - column 9, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4518044 (WIEGARDT GORDON K [US], et al) [A] 1-3,10 * column A * * column 3, line 6 - column 17, line 62; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4703429 (SAKATA MASAO [JP]) [A] 1-3,10-12 * column A * * column 2, line 63 - column 9, line 29; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US5320186 (STROSSER RICHARD P [US], et al) [A] 1-3,10 * column A * * column 2, line 59 - column 9, line 43; figures 1-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08048198 A 19960220 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |