Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
20.06.2003 | First examination report | |
14.06.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
07.03.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
31.01.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
24.01.2003 | Change - classification | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] |
04.12.2002 | Renewal fee | |
06.09.2002 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] |
07.12.2001 | Renewal fee | |
07.04.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |