EP1003296 - Base station power control method and system capable of smoothly executing handoff [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Seiji, c/o NEC Saitama, Ltd. 300-18, Aza Toyohara, Oaza Motohara, Kamikawamachi Kodama-gun, Saitama / JP | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122874.3 | 17.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | JP19980327383 | 18.11.1998 Original published format: JP 32738398 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1003296 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1003296 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04L1/18, H04Q7/38 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
H04W52/40 (EP);
H04B7/155 (KR);
H04L1/0001 (EP);
H04W52/48 (EP);
H04W52/143 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/43] | H04B7/005, H04L1/18 | ||
Former IPC [2000/21] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Basistationsleistungsregelung mit Fähigkeit zur sanften Durchfürung der Weiterreichen | [2000/21] | English: | Base station power control method and system capable of smoothly executing handoff | [2000/21] | French: | Procédé et système de commande de la puissance des stations de base capable de l'execution en douceur d'une transfert de communication | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5778309 (TUTTLE JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,11 * abstract *; column 1, line 51 - line 67 * * column 2, line 42 - line 51 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0565507 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [A] 1,5,7,11 * page 3, line 10 - line 54 * * page 6, line 34 - line 45 * * figure 2 *; | [A]GB2318256 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 11 * abstract *; page 3, line 3 - line 11 * * page 5, line 1 - line 9 * * page 6, line 29 - page 8, line 7 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5648955 (JENSEN RYAN N [US], et al) [A] 11 * column 12, line 30 - line 57 * * column 14, line 54 - line 65 * * column 16, line 26 - line 47 * * column 19, line 1 - line 53 * * figures 1-4 * |