EP1063875 - Surface mounting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirae Corporation 9-2 Chaam-dong Chunan-shi Choongchungnam-do / KR | [2007/02] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Mirae Corporation 9-2 Chaam-dong Chunan-shi, Choongchungnam-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yi, Yun Hyung Poongsan Joongmyung ATP. 104-202 1614 Jookjun-ri Suji-eup, Yongin-si Kyungki-do / KR | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 10 26 06 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/52] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122961.8 | 18.11.1999 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | KR19220048899 | 16.06.1999 Original published format: KR 2248899 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063875 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1063875 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
H05K13/0406 (EP,US);
H05K13/04 (KR);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49131 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/37] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Oberflächenmontage | [2000/52] | English: | Surface mounting device | [2000/52] | French: | Dispositif de montage en surface | [2006/39] |
Former [2000/52] | Dispositif de montage de surface | Examination procedure | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.01.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | FR | 31.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5203061 (HAMADA SHOZI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5860208 (NOMURA HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1-4* the whole document * |