EP1002713 - Force transfer mechanism for a bicycle transmission control cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, 3-cho Oimatsu-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, 3-cho Oimatsu-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ose, Kenji 2-2131-1-204, Hishiki Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/32] | Wallinger, Michael, Dr.-Ing. Wallinger & Partner, Patentanwälte, Zweibrückenstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123041.8 | 19.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | US19980196210 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: US 196210 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1002713 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1002713 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002713 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/02, B62M25/04 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
B62M25/04 (EP,US);
B62M25/02 (EP,US);
B62M2025/003 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20043 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20049 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20287 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/21] | B62M25/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2001/34] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftübertragungsmechanismus für Fahrradgangschaltungskabel | [2000/21] | English: | Force transfer mechanism for a bicycle transmission control cable | [2000/21] | French: | Dispositif de transmission de force pour câble de changement de vitesse de bicyclette | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 01.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 06.12.2001 | Observations by third parties | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01115481.2 / EP1134157 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0585473 (MAEDA IND [JP]) [A] 1,13-15,18 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE29603500U (GAERTNER JENS [DE]) [A] 1,13-15,18 * figure -; claim . *; | [A]EP0849157 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1,13-15,18 * figure -; claims 1,47 *; | [A]WO9842530 (GUYMER ANTHONY ERNEST [AU], et al) [A] 1,13-15,18 * page 4, line 1 - line 21; figure - *; | [A]EP0878387 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1,13-15,18* figure -; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0810150 | other | US4611561 | US4848502 |