EP1008810 - Household apparatus with a control element movable in two directions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhoferstrasse 135 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prof.Pichert Horst Lützelsteiner Str.22 D-80939 München / DE | 02 /
Riller Peter Uhlandweg 43 D-90547 Stein / DE | [2000/24] | Application number, filing date | 99123326.3 | 23.11.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | DE1998154576 | 26.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19854576 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008810 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1008810 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008810 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
F24C7/083 (EP,US);
D06F34/30 (EP,US);
D06F2101/12 (EP,US);
D06F2101/18 (EP,US);
D06F2103/00 (EP,US);
D06F2105/10 (EP,US);
D06F2105/28 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US);
H01H2300/054 (EP);
H01H25/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2004/43] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Haushaltgerät mit zweidimensional bewegbarem Bedienelement | [2000/24] | English: | Household apparatus with a control element movable in two directions | [2000/24] | French: | Appareil ménager avec un élément de commande mobile dans deux directions | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 26.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3906585 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5680797 (ELSAESSER FABIAN [DE]); | [E]DE19825310 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [E] 1,6 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE3906585 | DE4135363 | DE4306577 | DE19756475 | DE19706278 |