EP1006044 - Fork-lift truck with driving cabin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STILL GmbH Berzeliusstrasse 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states STILL GMBH Berzeliusstrasse 10 D-22113 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Ivo, Dipl.-Ing. Tatermoor 3 21516 Schulendorf / DE | 02 /
Schultz, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. Lerchenstrasse 2 19288 Neu-Krenzlin / DE | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123339.6 | 23.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | DE1998221628U | 03.12.1998 Original published format: DE 29821628 U | [2000/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1006044 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
B66F9/07545 (EP,US);
B62D33/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flurförderzeug mit einer Fahrerkabine | [2000/23] | English: | Fork-lift truck with driving cabin | [2000/23] | French: | Chariot de manutention à cabine de conduite | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/03] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |