EP1008767 - Assembling device for furniture panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rioja Calvo, Miguel Angel Lecera, 1 20800 Zarautz (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Feldkamp, Rainer, et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123537.5 | 26.11.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | ES19980002564 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: ES 9802564 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008767 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/20 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
F16B12/2036 (EP);
F16B12/46 (EP);
F16B2012/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/09] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung für Platten von Möbeln | [2000/24] | English: | Assembling device for furniture panels | [2000/24] | French: | Système de fixation pour panneaux d'ameublement | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/37] | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2040385 (HEINZE RICHARD GMBH CO KG) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,5,6 * * abstract * * page 1, line 83 - line 111 * * page 3, line 112 - page 4, line 75 * [A] 3; | [A]DE2610200 (HEINZE FA R) [A] 1-3 * figures 3,7,8,16,17 *; | [A]US5676487 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER HORST ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * |