EP1004833 - Heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max Weishaupt GmbH Max-Weishaupt-Strasse 88477 Schwendi / DE | [2000/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Litfin, Diethard Max-Weishaupt-Strasse 88475 Schwendi / DE | 02 /
Wirth, Christoph Max-Weishaupt-Strasse 88475 Schwendi / DE | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Kastel, Stefan, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Kastel, Stefan Dipl.-Phys., et al Flügel, Preissner & Kastel, Postfach 81 05 06 81905 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/22] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lesser, Flügel & Kastel, Wissmannstrasse 14 81929 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123584.7 | 26.11.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | DE1998154910 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19854910 | [2000/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1004833 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1004833 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/28, F24H9/12, F24H9/00 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
F24H9/0015 (EP);
F24H1/285 (EP);
F24H9/0036 (EP);
F24H9/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | Heizkessel | [2000/22] | English: | Heater | [2000/22] | French: | Chaudière | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 11.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/21] | 27.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3601000 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * claim 1 * * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - line 28 * * figure 1 * * enthält Patent DE 3524017 A (siehe Anspruch 1, Abbildungen 1-3, Seite 6) *; | [X]FR1560514 (UNION MARITIME) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE3329777 (FISCHER GEORG GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]GB1383545 (NIPPON MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS MFG) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,4 * * column 1 *; | [AD]EP0745805 (PYROPAC AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0387859 (PC PATENTCONSULT AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3210327 (WOLF KLIMATECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 8 * abstract * * claim 1 * * page 3, line 10 - line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0663563 (ELCO KLOECKNER HEIZTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 2,3 * | by applicant | DE195199634 | EP0387859 |