EP1005802 - Shoe stretcher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIAC S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 11-13 20139 Milano / IT | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crespi, Roberta Via Mazzini, 35/A 20020 Busto Garolfo (MI) / IT | 02 /
Vignati, Romano Via Mazzini, 35/A 20020 Busto Garolfo(Mi) / IT | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Savi, Alberto, et al c/o CON LOR SPA, Via Renato Fucini, 5 20133 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Savi, Alberto, et al c/o CON LOR SPA, Via Renato Fucini, 5 20133 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99123613.4 | 26.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | IT1998MI00783 | 02.12.1998 Original published format: IT MI980783 | [2000/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1005802 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1005802 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A43D3/14 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
A43D3/1475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/41] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schuhspanner | [2000/23] | English: | Shoe stretcher | [2000/23] | French: | Embauchoir | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.08.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR678019 (ARGENCE;ARGENCE ALFRED-VICTORIEN) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 46 - line 58; figure - *; | [X]US1488115 (HANSEN JOHN S) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]GB249528 (ALFRED VICTORIN ARGENCE) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 2; figures 1,2 * |