Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1005797
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.04.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
22.06.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
14.07.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
04.07.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.07.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.02.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
07.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
15.05.2002 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
01.03.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
28.01.2002 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
16.01.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.11.2001 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
02.11.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] |
03.08.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.09.2001 [2001/38] |
09.02.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
20.04.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] |