Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9616364 | Global Dossier | 30.05.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3287360B | Global Dossier | 04.06.2002 | B2 | JPH10503277 | 24.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3034308B | Global Dossier | 17.04.2000 | B2 | JPH09503289 | 31.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1596143 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2007 | B1 | EP1596143 | 30.11.2005 | A3 | EP1596143 | 16.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | EP99123296 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0984236 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2002 | B1 | EP0984236 | 24.05.2000 | A3 | EP0984236 | 08.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0984234 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2003 | B1 | EP0984234 | 24.05.2000 | A3 | EP0984234 | 08.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0984233 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2000 | A3 | EP0984233 | 08.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0984232 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2002 | B1 | EP0984232 | 17.05.2000 | A3 | EP0984232 | 08.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0984231 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2005 | B1 | EP0984231 | 17.05.2000 | A3 | EP0984231 | 08.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0984230 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2005 | B1 | EP0984230 | 17.05.2000 | A3 | EP0984230 | 08.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0984229 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2005 | B1 | EP0984229 | 17.05.2000 | A3 | EP0984229 | 08.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0982552 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2002 | B1 | EP0982552 | 17.05.2000 | A3 | EP0982552 | 01.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0791162 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2004 | B1 | EP0791162 | 27.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0740809 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2002 | B1 | EP0740809 | 06.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU686901B | Global Dossier | 12.02.1998 | B2 | AU3881795 | 17.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU707209B | Global Dossier | 08.07.1999 | B2 | AU3816695 | 06.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0984235 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2002 | B1 | EP0984235 | 24.05.2000 | A3 | EP0984235 | 08.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | EP95936118 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2180113 | 03.08.1999 | C | CA2180113 | 30.05.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2190018 | 24.04.2001 | C | CA2190018 | 23.05.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1146766C | 21.04.2004 | C | CN1138906 | 25.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19581557 | 13.06.2001 | C2 | DE19581557T | 27.03.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69529929T | 11.12.2003 | T2 | DE69529929D1 | 17.04.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69532818T | 27.01.2005 | T2 | DE69532818D1 | 06.05.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2299872 | 17.03.1999 | B | GB2299872 | 16.10.1996 | A | GB9613585D0 | 28.08.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN185688 | 31.03.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0160435B | 15.01.1999 | B1 | KR960044037 | 23.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0160436B | 15.01.1999 | B1 | KR960044038 | 23.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0160437B | 15.01.1999 | B1 | KR960044041 | 23.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0160438B | 15.01.1999 | B1 | KR960044039 | 23.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0160439B | 15.01.1999 | B1 | KR960044040 | 23.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0182534B | 01.05.1999 | B1 | KR960018479 | 17.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0182758B | 01.05.1999 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19980035250 | 28.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0182759B | 01.05.1999 | B1 | KR19990000001 | 01.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19980035251 | 28.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100189100B | 01.06.1999 | B1 | KR960018467 | 17.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9602685 | 30.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9605554 | 28.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY112940 | 31.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY115998 | 31.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ294934 | 24.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ295467 | 26.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2130570 | 20.05.1999 | C1 | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2137064 | 10.09.1999 | C1 | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK283586B | 07.10.2003 | B6 | SK143996 | 08.07.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK91796 | 05.11.1997 | A3 | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5816054 | 06.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500149 | 17.11.1995 | KR19940030325 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030326 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030781 | 22.11.1994 | KR19950014286 | 31.05.1995 | KR19950000040 | 04.01.1995 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950000039 | 04.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5931004 | 03.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9500147 | 11.11.1995 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9615413 | Global Dossier | 23.05.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1120342C | 03.09.2003 | C | CN1154740 | 16.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69529237T | 06.11.2003 | T2 | DE69529237D1 | 30.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69529238T | 06.11.2003 | T2 | DE69529238D1 | 30.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030224 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69529239T | 30.10.2003 | T2 | DE69529239D1 | 30.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69529240T | 16.10.2003 | T2 | DE69529240D1 | 30.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69534454T | 22.06.2006 | T2 | DE69534454D1 | 20.10.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69534455T | 22.06.2006 | T2 | DE69534455D1 | 20.10.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69534474T | 22.06.2006 | T2 | DE69534474D1 | 02.02.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69535436T | 06.12.2007 | T2 | DE69535436D1 | 03.05.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19940030323 | 17.11.1994 | KR19950012395 | 18.05.1995 | KR19940029478 | 11.11.1994 | KR19940030782 | 22.11.1994 | KR19940030322 | 17.11.1994 | KR19940030802 | 22.11.1994 | Type | Earlier application | EP0791162 |