EP1008499 - Belt retractor for a vehicle seat belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Andreas Waldstrasse 5 75368 Durlangen / DE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Sties, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123959.1 | 06.12.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | DE1998221801U | 07.12.1998 Original published format: DE 29821801 U | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008499 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1008499 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/34, B60R22/28 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
B60R22/3413 (EP,US);
B60R2022/286 (EP,US);
B60R2022/287 (EP,US);
B60R2022/288 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/35] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gurtaufroller für einen Fahrzeug-Sicherheitsgurt | [2000/24] | English: | Belt retractor for a vehicle seat belt | [2000/24] | French: | Rétracteur pour une ceinture de sécurité de véhicule | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.07.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19727919 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 28 - line 49 * * column 3, line 46 - line 62; figures 1,4 * [A] 2,3,6; | [XA]WO9749583 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 1; figure 5 * [A] 2,3,6; | [A]DE29708493U (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5618006 (SAYLES ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1,5,8,9 * abstract * |