EP1010458 - Fluid separation membranes formed from polyetherimides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langsam, Michael 1114 North 26 th Street Allentown, PA 18104-2902 / US | 02 /
Laciak, Daniel Vincent 5401 Yale Place Macungie, PA 18062 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124065.6 | 10.12.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | US19980212081 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: US 212081 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1010458 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/64 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
B01D71/64 (EP);
B01D71/643 (KR);
B01D53/228 (KR);
B01D53/268 (KR);
B01D69/08 (KR);
C08G73/1053 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Polyetherimid-Membranen zur Trennung von Fluiden | [2000/25] | English: | Fluid separation membranes formed from polyetherimides | [2000/25] | French: | Membranes de séparation de fluides obtenues à partir de polyétherimides | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |