EP1020403 - Haloalkyl silane containing zeolite powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lortz, Beata-Maria, Dr. Feldweg 9 63607 Wächtersbach / DE | 02 /
Lortz, Wolfgang, Dr. Feldweg 9 63607 Wächtersbach / DE | 03 /
Leonhardt, Wolfgang, Dr. Röderbergweg 41 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
Grohs, Joachim Ziegelei 32 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 05 /
Klotz, Oswin Bayernstrasse 14 63827 Westerngrund / DE | [2000/29] | Application number, filing date | 99124243.9 | 04.12.1999 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | DE1999101302 | 15.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19901302 | [2000/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020403 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/02 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
C01B39/026 (EP,KR);
C11D3/128 (EP,KR);
C11D3/162 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | Alkylhalogensilan enthaltene Zeolihpulver | [2000/29] | English: | Haloalkyl silane containing zeolite powder | [2000/29] | French: | Poudre de silice contenant un alkyl-silane halogéné | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 04.12.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63230515 ; | [A]JPS6252125 ; | [A]US4138363 (HERTZENBERG ELLIOT P, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 63 *; | [AD]EP0088158 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4451572 (CODY IAN A [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 19 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 44, Database accession no. 1988-312116, XP002134705 & JPS63230515 A 19880927 (JGC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 15, Database accession no. 1987-104945, XP002134706 & JPS6252125 A 19870306 (JGC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |