EP1006242 - System of sanitary fittings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansgrohe AG Auestrasse 5 - 9 77761 Schiltach / DE | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grohe, Klaus Auestrasse 5-9 77761 Schiltach / DE | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124280.1 | 04.12.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | DE19981056155 | 05.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19856155 | [2000/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1006242 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1006242 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006242 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/02 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
E03C1/021 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Extension states | SI | 21.04.2001 | Title | German: | System von Sanitärarmaturen | [2000/23] | English: | System of sanitary fittings | [2000/23] | French: | Système de robinetteries sanitaires | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.11.2005
23.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Grohe Water Technology AG & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 137 58675 Hemer / DE | 02
01.12.2005
19.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE Heinrich Schulte GmbH & Co. KG Grünlandweg 11 58640 Iserlohn / DE Opponent's representative Tarvenkorn, Oliver Patentanwälte Dr. Hoffmeister & Tarvenkorn Postfach 3828 48021 Münster / DE | 03
01.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE Kludi GmbH & Co.KG Am Vogelsang 31-33 58706 Menden / DE Opponent's representative Tarvenkorn, Oliver Patentanwälte Dr. Hoffmeister & Tarvenkorn Postfach 3828 48021 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.11.2005
23.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Grohe Water Technology AG & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 137 58675 Hemer / DE | ||
02
01.12.2005
19.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE Heinrich Schulte GmbH & Co. KG Auf der Aeumes 12 58636 Iserlohn / DE Opponent's representative Tarvenkorn, Oliver Patentanwälte, Dr. Hoffmeister & Tarvenkorn, Postfach 3828 48021 Münster / DE | |||
03
01.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE Kludi GmbH & Co.KG Am Vogelsang 31-33 58706 Menden / DE Opponent's representative Tarvenkorn, Oliver Patentanwälte, Dr. Hoffmeister & Tarvenkorn, Postfach 3828 48021 Münster / DE | |||
Former [2006/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.11.2005
23.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Grohe Water Technology AG & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 137 58675 Hemer / DE | ||
02
01.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE Heinrich Schulte GmbH & Co. KG Auf der Aeumes 12 58636 Iserlohn / DE Opponent's representative Tarvenkorn, Oliver Patentanwälte, Dr. Hoffmeister & Tarvenkorn, Postfach 3828 48021 Münster / DE | |||
Former [2006/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Grohe Water Technology AG & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 137 58675 Hemer / DE | 13.02.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.04.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.07.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2007 | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.08.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/51] | 19.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.03.2005 | IE | 02.03.2005 | NL | 02.03.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | AT | 04.12.2005 | CY | 04.12.2005 | BE | 31.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | GB | 04.12.2006 | CH | 31.12.2006 | LI | 31.12.2006 | DK | 02.01.2007 | FR | 02.01.2007 | DE | 03.07.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/17] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
SE | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
AT | 04.12.2005 | ||
CY | 04.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
GB | 04.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
DK | 02.01.2007 | ||
DE | 03.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
AT | 04.12.2005 | ||
CY | 04.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
CY | 04.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3519652 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 1-9,11-13* figure - *; | [X]DE3816519 (ROMANELLI ANTONIO [IT]) [X] 1-3,6-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0590960 (ORAS OY [FI]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5730184 (MOENCH HEINER [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-9,13,15 * column 2, line 20 - line 61; figure - * | by applicant | DE19622368 |