blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1014589

EP1014589 - A variable length codeword decoder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10333 North Meridian Street
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10330 North Meridian St
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cooper, Jeffrey Allen
5015 Knoll Crest Court
Indianapolis, IN 46228 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Rumpler, Wolfgang, et al
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/27]Rumpler, Wolfgang, Dr., et al
Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora, Patentanwälte, Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
Former [2000/26]Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date99124282.704.12.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateUS1998021304116.12.1998         Original published format: US 213041
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1014589
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1014589
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1014589
Date:10.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2001
ClassificationIPC:H03M7/42
[2001/18]
CPC:
H03M7/40 (EP,US); H04N19/42 (KR); H04N19/91 (KR)
Former IPC [2000/26]H03M7/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/07]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dekodierer für Kodes variabler Länge[2008/33]
English:A variable length codeword decoder[2000/26]
French:Décodeur pour mots de code à longueur variable[2000/26]
Former [2000/26]Dekodierer für Kodes variabeler Länger
Examination procedure02.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
04.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.02.2008
14.02.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
28.02.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
10.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2008Fee for grant paid
27.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.06.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
16.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
21.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9821831  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,13 * page 5, line 6 - page 5, line 19; figures 1-6 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 9 * * page 15, line 19 - page 17, line 22 *;
 [A]US5557271  (RIM CHAI Y [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 9 *;
 [A]EP0562419  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 11 * * column 17, line 26 - column 17, line 30 *;
 [A]US5225832  (WANG JINN-SHYAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 8,9 *
ExaminationEP0798931
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.