Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] |
02.08.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.02.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.12.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.01.2003 | Renewal fee | |
23.11.2001 | Renewal fee | |
19.04.2001 | Change - extension states | |
16.02.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] |
22.12.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] |
02.06.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |