EP1020160 - Filter bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Papier-Verarbeitungs GmbH Werkstrasse 5 32139 Spenge / DE | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plociennik, Heinrich Hollensiek 12a 33619 Bielefeld / DE | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124621.6 | 10.12.1999 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | DE1999200255U | 12.01.1999 Original published format: DE 29900255 U | [2000/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020160 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/14 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
A47L9/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | Filterbeutel | [2000/29] | English: | Filter bag | [2000/29] | French: | Sac filtrant | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/01] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1119757 (HOOVER LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 6 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 6 - page 3, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 5, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 6, column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 5-8,13-15 *; | [X]DE3129371 (VORWERK & CO INTERHOLDING GMBH) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 5, line 5 - line 13 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1305709 (ELECTROLUX LTD) [X] 1,4 * page 2, line 34 - line 82 * * page 3, line 22 - line 38 * * figures 1-3,6,7 *; | [A]US3596443 (GOLDBERG H Z) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 26 - line 45 * * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 69 - column 5, line 17 * * figures 1-4,12-16 *; | [PX]DE29820867U (BRANOFILTER GMBH) [PX] 1,3,4 * claim . * * page 14, line 18 - line 20 * * figure - * |