EP1010441 - Fire sprinkler systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Project Fire Engineers Limited Sandyford Street Stafford ST16 3NF / GB | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cain, Bernard 54 Weeping Cross Stafford ST17 oDL / GB | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Lally, William FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Lally, William FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124665.3 | 10.12.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | GB19980027434 | 14.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9827434 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1010441 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1010441 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A62C35/02 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
A62C35/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/21] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Feuerlöschsprinkeranlage | [2000/25] | English: | Fire sprinkler systems | [2000/25] | French: | Système de têtes d'extinction d'incendie | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/01] | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.04.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4366865 (MAKIBBIN JAMES J [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - line 66 * * column 2, line 3 - line 7 * * column 4, line 11 - line 16 * * column 4, line 44 - line 52 * * figure 2 * [Y] 3,4,7; | [Y]GB2280368 (PROJECT FIRE ENGINEERS LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 3,4,7 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2274776 (BLACK MALCOLM JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | GB2280368 |