EP1014082 - Fluid condition monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/26] | Fluid condition monitor | ||
[2004/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, PT | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Robert A. 504 Michigan Avenue South Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53172 / US | 02 /
Hirthe, Richard W. 3006 South Superior Street Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53207 / US | 03 /
Polczynski, Mark H. 1180 Legion Drive Elm Grove, Wisconsin 53122 / US | 04 /
Seitz, Martin A. 14895 San Raphael Drive Brookfield, Wisconsin 53005 / US | 05 /
Hansen, James E. 8260 South Verdev Drive Oak Creek, Wisconsin 53154 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124893.1 | 17.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19980220556 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: US 220556 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1014082 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1014082 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014082 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/22, G01N33/28 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G01N27/221 (EP,US);
G01N27/04 (KR);
G01N33/2888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | Überwachung des Zustandes von einem Fluidum | [2000/26] | English: | Fluid condition monitoring | [2004/38] | French: | Contrôle de l'état d'un fluide | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/26] | Fluid condition monitor | Examination procedure | 21.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2005 | BE | 02.03.2005 | CH | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | LI | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS57108650 ; | [X]DE1498815 (INDUSTRIAL NUCLEONICS CORP) [X] 1,6,8,17 * page 1 - page 2 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4646070 (YASUHARA SEISHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5,12 * column 5, line 3 - line 14 *; | [A]US4692685 (BLAZE KEVIN L [AU]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 17 *; | [A]US5526808 (KAMINSKY ALLAN L [US]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]DE19540507 (FACHHOCHSCHULE ULM [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5824889 (PARK KYONG M [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,12 * column 2, line 41 - line 48 * * figure 7 *; | [A]WO9850790 (LUBRIGARD LIMITED [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821007), vol. 006, no. 198, Database accession no. (P - 147), & JP57108650 A 19820706 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6-8,17 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,12 |