EP1014598 - Reconfigurable satellite with modifiable antenna coverage and communications backup capabilities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo California 90245-0956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thompson, James D. 424 Marine Avenue, Apt. A Manhattan Beach, California 90266 / US | 02 /
Ramanujam, Parthasarathy 2601 Fisk Lane Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | 03 /
Dixon, Cynthia A. 29018 Covecrest Drive Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90275 / US | 04 /
Feuerborn, Debbie H. 16315 Flat Peak Lane Cerritos, California 90703 / US | 05 /
Goldberg, David R. 310 The Village, Apt. No. 102 Redondo Beach, California 90277 / US | 06 /
Sichi, Stephen F. 7907 Croydon Avenue Los Angeles, California 90045 / US | 07 /
Shah, Lomash J. 1104 Esplanade, Apt. No. 303 Redondo Beach, California 90277 / US | 08 /
Dunwoody, John R. 6830 E. 10th Street Long Beach, 90815 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124965.7 | 15.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19980222419 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: US 222419 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1014598 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1014598 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014598 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H04B7/2041 (EP,US);
H04B7/18519 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/14] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Umkonfigurierbarer Satellit mit veränderbarer Antennenbedeckung und Kommunikations-Überlagerungsfähigkeiten | [2000/32] | English: | Reconfigurable satellite with modifiable antenna coverage and communications backup capabilities | [2000/26] | French: | Satellite reconfigurable ayant une couverture d'antenne modifiable et des possibilités de sauvegarde de communications | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/26] | Umstellbarer Satellit mit veränderbahre Antenna Bedeckung und Vermögen zur Sicherung der Übertragungen | Examination procedure | 31.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 22.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO0103310 (ASSURESAT INC [US]) [E] 1-3 * page 15, line 19 - line 33 * * page 24, line 19 - line 34 * * page 25, line 9 - line 23 *; | [YA]EP0845833 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 8, line 24 - line 37 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 12 * [A] 4-10; | [YA]EP0854590 (COM DEV LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-3 * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 57 * * column 10, line 29 - line 41 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 4-10 |