EP1014071 - Coma aberration automatic measuring mark and measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Hirofumi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125043.2 | 15.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | JP19980356299 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35629998 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1014071 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1014071 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/02 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G01M11/0264 (EP,US);
G01B11/24 (KR);
G03F7/706 (EP,US);
G03F7/70683 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/13] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatisches Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung einer Komaaberration-Markierung | [2000/26] | English: | Coma aberration automatic measuring mark and measuring method | [2000/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositif automatique de mesure d'une marquage d'aberration de coma | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 26.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5835227 (GRODNENSKY ILYA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-12 * column 8, line 32 - line 45; figures 3,8,11 * * column 14, line 30 - line 35 * [Y] 4,7; | [Y]JPS63306624 ; | [A]US4908656 (SUWA KYOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,9 * column 21, line 66 - column 22, line 8; figures 5,8,30 *; | [A]EP0849638 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890410), vol. 013, no. 144, Database accession no. (E - 740), & JP63306624 A 19881214 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 4,7 * abstract * |