EP1011003 - Light-scanning optical system and image-forming apparatus comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/33] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishibe, Yoshihiro, c/o Canon K. K. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125045.7 | 15.12.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | JP19980375734 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: JP 37573498 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1011003 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1011003 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1011003 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/12 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
G02B26/127 (EP,US);
G02B26/10 (KR);
H04N1/047 (EP,US);
H04N1/1135 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0471 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04744 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04786 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/19] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches System zum Lichtabtasten und dessen Verwendung in einer Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2000/25] | English: | Light-scanning optical system and image-forming apparatus comprising the same | [2000/25] | French: | Système optique de balayage à lumière et dispositif de formation d'images de la même utilisation | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 08.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.02.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5841566 (MINAKUCHI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9 * column 2, line 30 - line 53; figure 4 * * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 18 *; | [X]US5748356 (PARK CHANG JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 15; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0269450 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,10 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 9; figures 1,4,6,8 * * column 6, line 14 - line 54 * * column 4, line 42 - line 62 *; | [XA]US4878066 (SHIRAISHI TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * column 1, line 5 - line 52; figures 1,8,9,16,25 * * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 18 * [A] 3; | [X]US4978975 (SAITO HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,4-6 * column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US4788560 (MIURA KUNIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,9,10 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 60; figures 1-3,7 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 6 *; | [X]US5200611 (HATTORI YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * column 3, line 60 - column 6, line 2; figures 2,7-9 * |