blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1011251

EP1011251 - Method for error checking and evaluation of messages by members of an operator service and corresponding equipped switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.03.2006  [2006/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Adli, Wahid
Kratochwjlestrasse 12/2/27
1220 Wien / AT
[2000/25]
Application number, filing date99125226.317.12.1999
[2000/25]
Priority number, dateDE199815835617.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19858356
[2000/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1011251
Date:21.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1011251
Date:28.01.2004
[2004/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1011251
Date:23.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04M3/51, H04M3/22, H04M3/24
[2004/05]
CPC:
H04M3/245 (EP); H04M3/51 (EP); H04M3/60 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/25]H04M3/24, H04M3/51
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/43]
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Fehlerüberprüfung und Auswertung der Meldungen von Mitgliedern eines Operatorservice sowie dazu eingerichtete Vermittlungsstelle[2000/25]
English:Method for error checking and evaluation of messages by members of an operator service and corresponding equipped switch[2000/25]
French:Procédé de vérification d' erreurs et d' evaluation des messages par les membres d'un service d'operateur et commutateur équipé en conséquénce[2000/25]
Examination procedure19.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
24.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2005Fee for grant paid
20.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0849961  (TELECOM USA INC [US]) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 7 * * column 7, line 30 - column 7, line 47; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0705017  (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * page 3, line 32 - page 3, line 41 * * page 19, line 10 - page 19, line 26; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4656624  (COLLINS JOHNNY [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - column 3, line 6; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.