EP1014531 - Power supply apparatus for explosion-proof electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/26] | Power supply apparatus for explosion-proof electronic componants | ||
[2009/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, DK, GR, IE, IT, PT, SE | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Turck Gmbh & Co. KG Witzlebenstrasse 7 45472 Mülheim / DE | [2010/10] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Hans Turck Gmbh & Co. KG Witzlebenstrasse 7 45472 Mülheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarzfischer, Johann Auf'm Kahr, 13 45239 Essen / DE | 02 /
Volz, Hubert Steinkuhle, 71 45470 Mühlheim a.d. Ruhr / DE | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Grundmann, Dirk, Dr., et al c/o Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125477.2 | 21.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE19981059715 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859715 | DE19991049649 | 14.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19949649 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1014531 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1014531 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014531 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02J5/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H02J50/402 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Extension states | AL | 23.11.2001 | LT | 23.11.2001 | LV | 23.11.2001 | MK | 23.11.2001 | RO | 23.11.2001 | SI | 23.11.2001 | Title | German: | Energieversorgungsvorrichtung für explosionsgeschützte elektronische Funktionseinheiten | [2000/26] | English: | Power supply apparatus for explosion-proof electronic components | [2009/45] | French: | Appareil d'alimentation en énergie électrique pour composants électroniques anti-déflagrant | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/26] | Power supply apparatus for explosion-proof electronic componants | Examination procedure | 23.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 07.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2010 | DK | 10.03.2010 | FI | 10.03.2010 | IE | 10.03.2010 | IT | 10.03.2010 | NL | 10.03.2010 | SE | 10.03.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | PT | 12.07.2010 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/45] | FI | 10.03.2010 | |
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | FI | 10.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1428188 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1 * page 8, column 112 - page 9, column 3 *; | [X]US4342061 (RICE DARRELL, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 10 *; | [A]EP0357829 (TOPPAN MOORE KK [JP]) [A] 1,7 * figures 4-6 *; | [A]US5301096 (KLONTZ KEITH W [US], et al); | [A]WO9602970 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al) |