EP1016628 - Process for the preparation of precipitated calcium carbonate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Chemicals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [2005/22] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Solvay Soda Deutschland GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinnen, Andreas, Dr. Kahle Plack 46509 Xanten / DE | 02 /
Dillenburg, Helmut, Dr. Willinger Weg 14 a 47495 Rheinberg / DE | 03 /
Schinninger, Kurt, Dr. Esterhazystrasse 3 5400 Hallein / AT | 04 /
Nover, Christoph, Dr. Kolberger Weg 5 47495 Rheinberg / DE | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2005/22] | Kulik, Angelika, et al Solvay Fluor GmbH, SFLU-IAM, Postfach 220 30002 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | Gosmann, Martin, Dr., et al Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Patentabteilung Postfach 220 30002 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2000/27] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr., et al Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125609.0 | 22.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | DE1999100021 | 02.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19900021 | [2000/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016628 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01F11/18 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
C01F11/181 (EP,US);
C01F11/18 (KR);
Y02P20/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von gefälltem Calciumcarbonat | [2000/27] | English: | Process for the preparation of precipitated calcium carbonate | [2000/27] | French: | Procédé de production de carbonate de calcium précipité | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05221634 ; | [DA]US3920800 (HARRIS DWIGHT L); | [X]EP0140644 (OKUTAMA KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 1; claim - *; | [A]US4888160 (KOSIN JOHN A [US], et al); | [X]EP0480587 (ECC INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 33 - line 35; example 4; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931210), vol. 017, no. 674, Database accession no. (C - 1140), & JP05221634 A 19930831 (HARIMA CERAMIC CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |