Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3606079B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2005 | B2 | JP2000191371 | 11.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP36952798 | 25.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1013625 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2014 | B1 | EP1013625 | 27.09.2000 | A3 | EP1013625 | 28.06.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP36952798 | 25.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6380118 | 30.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP36952798 | 25.12.1998 |