EP1013625 - Nonlinear dielectric ceramic, pulse generating capacitor, high-pressure vapor discharge lamp circuit, and high-pressure vapor discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2007/42] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Kazuhiro c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Sano Harunobu c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2013/52] |
Former [2000/26] | 01 /
Harada, Kazuhiro, (A170) Intellect., Prop., Dept. Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Sano Harunobu, (A170) Intellect., Prop., Dept. Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125623.1 | 22.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | JP19980369527 | 25.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36952798 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1013625 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1013625 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013625 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/468, H01G4/12, H05B41/04 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C04B35/4682 (EP,US);
H01G4/1227 (EP,US);
H05B41/04 (EP,US);
H05B41/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/24] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nichtlineare dielektrische keramische Zusammensetzung, impulserzeugender Kondensator, Schaltung für Hochdruckdampfentladungslampe und Hochdruckdampfentladungslampe | [2000/26] | English: | Nonlinear dielectric ceramic, pulse generating capacitor, high-pressure vapor discharge lamp circuit, and high-pressure vapor discharge lamp | [2000/26] | French: | Composition céramique diélectrique non-linéaire, condensateur de production d'impulsions, circuit pour lampe à décharge à vapeur haute pression et lampe à décharge à vapeur haute pression | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 25.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2002 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0605904 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,10-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 12 *; | [PX]EP0893419 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [PX] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 44 * * figures 4,5 * * claim - *; | [A]JPH01136323 ; | [A]JPS63221504 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890825), vol. 013, no. 386, Database accession no. (E - 812), & JP01136323 A 19890529 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 12, Database accession no. 1989-091123, XP002144310 & JPS63221504 A 19880914 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |