EP1013626 - Ceramic matrix composite and method for changing the dielectric properties of a ceramic matrix composite [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COI CERAMICS, INC. 9617 Distribution Avenue San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2003/35] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bridgewater, Todd Jeffrey 1023 Brissette Beach Kawkawlin, Michigan 48632 / US | 02 /
Szweda, Andrew 1500 Settlers Passage Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | 03 /
Petrak, Daniel Ralph 723 West Saginaw Road Sanford, Michigan 48657 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125680.1 | 22.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19980220172 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: US 220172 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1013626 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1013626 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013626 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/80, C04B41/85, C04B38/00 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
C04B35/589 (EP,US);
C04B35/571 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B38/0003 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0003, C04B41/45 (US,EP);
C04B38/00, C04B35/80, C04B38/0003, C04B38/0074, C04B41/4554, C04B41/52 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2000/26] | C04B35/80 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/21] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbundwerkstoff mit keramischer Matrix und Verfahren zum Verändern der dielektrischen Eigenschaften eines Verbundwerkstoffs mit keramischer Matrix | [2000/26] | English: | Ceramic matrix composite and method for changing the dielectric properties of a ceramic matrix composite | [2000/26] | French: | Matériau composite à matrice céramique et procédé de changement des propriétés diélectriques d'un matériau composite à matrice céramique | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US5707471 (PETRAK DANIEL RALPH [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - line 60 * * column 2, line 8 - line 13 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 17 * * column 5, line 48 - line 59 * * column 7, line 33 - line 46 * * claims 1,13,14 *[A] 3,10-17 |