EP1099401 - Central Vacuum interface for air exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states White Consolidated Industries, Inc. 18013 Cleveland Parkway Cleveland Ohio 44135-0920 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states White Consolidated Industries, Inc. 18013 Cleveland Parkway Cleveland Ohio 44135-0920 / US | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states White Consolidated Industries, Inc. 18013 Cleveland Parkway Cleveland, Ohio 44135-0920 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Price, Tamara P.O. Box 441 Webster City, Iowa 50595 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Douglas E. 107 Angela Drive Webster City, Iowa 50595 / US | 03 /
Koestner, Mitch 1332 Steiner Blvd. Webster City, Iowa 50595 / US | 04 /
Cunningham, Vern 62 Hoskall Crescent Aurora, Ontario L4G 5T6 / CA | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development 90327 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Group Intellectual Property 90327 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2006/11] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al AEG Hausgeräte GmbH, Patente, Marken & Lizenzen 90327 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Höchtl, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Patente, Marken und Lizenzen 90327 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125743.7 | 23.12.1999 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | US19990439784 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: US 439784 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099401 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099401 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099401 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47L5/38, A47L9/28 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
A47L9/2894 (EP,US);
A47L5/38 (EP,US);
A47L9/2842 (EP,US);
A47L9/2857 (EP,US);
A47L9/2889 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | Koppeleinheit für Vakuumzentralanlage und Wärmetauscher | [2001/20] | English: | Central Vacuum interface for air exchanger | [2001/20] | French: | Unité d'accouplement pour système d'aspiration centralisé et échangeur d'air | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2005 | BE | 26.10.2005 | CH | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | LI | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | CY | 23.12.2005 | IE | 23.12.2005 | PT | 23.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GB | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | ES | 06.02.2006 | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/17] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
CY | 23.12.2005 | ||
IE | 23.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GB | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
CY | 23.12.2005 | ||
IE | 23.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GB | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 23.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2725113 (FAGYAS STEVEN M) [X] 1,1 * column 12, line 39 - column 12, line 59; figures 12,27 * * the whole document * [A] 2-5; | [A]DE2440221 (THUERING WALTER) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 14 - page 3, line 18; figure . *; | [A]US3951336 (MILLER LOREN C, et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]US4238689 (BRESLIN JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5191673 (DAMIZET PATRICK [FR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |