EP1016791 - Arrangement of a fan unit for the heat-exchange assembly of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collinucci, Luigi Via Guidobono, 11 10137 Torino / IT | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2000/27] | Cian, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A. Corso Reggio Parco 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99125858.3 | 24.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | IT1998TO01098 | 30.12.1998 Original published format: IT TO981098 | [2000/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1016791 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1016791 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/60 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
F04D29/582 (EP);
F04D29/601 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2001/48] |
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung eines Lüfters für die Wärmeaustauscheinheit eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2000/27] | English: | Arrangement of a fan unit for the heat-exchange assembly of a motor vehicle | [2000/27] | French: | Dispositif pour le ventilateur dans l' unité échangeur de chaleur d' un véhicule automobile | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 08.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0085588 (CHAUSSON USINES SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 1, lines 17-19; figures 2,3 * * page 3, lines 3-6 *; | [X]US4685513 (LONGHOUSE RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *; | [A]US5219016 (BOLTON JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE4222264 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0704626 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5522704 (CASTEEL MALLARD [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, lines 22-27 * * column 5, lines 50-53 *; | [PX]DE19857512 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [PX] 1 * column 4, lines 24-29 - lines 38-40; claim 9 * |