EP1022693 - Closed system postage meter having address correction capabilities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarter, One Elmcroft Road Stamford, Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allport, Robert W. 10 Mayflower Court Harlow, Essex CM19 4SX / GB | 02 /
Kelley, Stephen 19 Birds Close Welwyn Garden City, Herfordshire AL7 4AR / GB | 03 /
Nicholls, Timothy J. The Ordards Kents Lane Standon, Herfordshire SG1 1PJ / GB | 04 /
Capelli, Christopher J. 75 Pheasant Run Willwood, NY 10546 / US | 05 /
Quine, Douglas B. 59 Taylor Road Bethel, CT 06801 / US | [2007/11] |
Former [2000/30] | 01 /
Allport, Robert W. 10 Mayflower Court Harlow, Essex CM19 4SX / GB | ||
02 /
Kelley, Stephen 19 Birds Close Welwyn Garden City, Herts. AL7 4AR / GB | |||
03 /
Nicholls, Timothy J. The Orchards, Kents Lane Standon, Herts. SG1 1PJ / GB | |||
04 /
Capelli, Christopher J. 75 Pheasant Run Willwood, NY 10546 / US | |||
05 /
Quine, Douglas B. 59 Taylor Road Bethel, CT 06801 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99126160.3 | 29.12.1999 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | US19980222644 | 30.12.1998 Original published format: US 222644 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022693 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022693 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022693 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
G07B17/0008 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G07B17/00435 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00161 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00169 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00451 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00588 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/33] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine eines geschlossenen Systems mit Adresskorrekturfähigkeit | [2000/30] | English: | Closed system postage meter having address correction capabilities | [2000/30] | French: | Machine à affranchir en système fermé avec possibilités de correction d'adresse | [2005/04] |
Former [2000/30] | Machine à affranchir avec système fermé ayant capabilité de correction d'addresse | Examination procedure | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR Opponent's representative CBDL Patentanwälte, et al, et al Königstraße 57 47051 Duisburg / DE | [2008/04] | 22.01.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.09.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/09] | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5586036 (PINTSOV LEON A [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 34 * * column 8, line 42 - column 9, line 17 * * figures 1,2,5 * [A] 2,3; | [A]EP0710930 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 3 - line 15 * * column 7, line 20 - column 9, line 65 *; | [A]US5703783 (ALLEN RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 2-4 * column 2, line 24 - line 65 * * column 6, line 4 - line 67; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0759596 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 2,3 * column 1, line 10 - line 55 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 23 * * figures 2,4,6A,6B * | by applicant | US4802218 | EP0927963 |