EP0943760 - Cylinder lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van der Wal Beheer B.V Weddehoenlaan 3 7471 ME Goor / NL | [2003/23] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Ankerslot bv Binnenhavenstraat 59 7550 AM Hengelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dondorff, Jan Potsweg 21 7523 CA Enschede / NL | 02 /
van der Wal, Jan Willem Weddehoenlaan 3 7471 ME Goor / NL | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Lips, Hendrik Jan George HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir. HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99200139.6 | 20.01.1999 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | NL19981008637 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: NL 1008637 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943760 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943760 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/20, E05B9/04 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
E05B17/2084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [2000/22] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zylinderschloss | [1999/38] | English: | Cylinder lock | [1999/38] | French: | Serrure cylindrique | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 23.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, FI, GR, IE, LI, MC, PT | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2003 | BE | 19.03.2003 | DK | 19.06.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/10] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 19.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1529071 (LEACH ALBERT E) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US2058895 (LOWE CHARLES B) [X] 1-3 * figure 13 *; | [X]US3019632 (RUSSELL FRED J) [X] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]FR2158680 (CAVERS ETS) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3801234 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 36 *; | [X]DE3904535 (KARRENBERG FA WILHELM [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5121619 (MARTIN FRANK J [US]) [X] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]DE19651432 (THEEDE JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |