Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0961216 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2006 | B1 | EP0961216 | 24.10.2001 | A3 | EP0961216 | 01.12.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IL12465598 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69931845T | 11.01.2007 | T2 | DE69931845D1 | 27.07.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IL12465598 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL124655 | 19.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | IL12465598 | 26.05.1998 |