EP0961216 - IC card-based test apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NDS LIMITED One Heathrow Boulevard 286 Bath Road West Drayton, Middlesex UB7 0BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states NDS LIMITED 1 Heathrow Boulevard, 286 Bath Road West Drayton Middlesex UB7 ODQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states NDS LIMITED 1 Heathrow Boulevard, 286 Bath Road West Drayton, Middlesex UB7 ODQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adler, Michael 11 Hate'ena Street Hashmonaim 73127 / IL | [2006/24] |
Former [1999/48] | 01 /
Adler, Michael 11 Hate'ena Street Hashimonaim 73127 / IL | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/05] | Freed, Arthur Woolf Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [1999/48] | Anderson, Angela Mary NDS Limited, Gamma House, Enterprise Road Chilworth, Hampshire SO16 7NS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99200839.1 | 17.03.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | IL19980124655 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: IL 12465598 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961216 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0961216 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961216 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K19/07, G06F11/273, G01R31/00, G06K19/077 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
G06F11/261 (EP);
G06K7/0008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/48] | G06K7/00, G06K19/07, G06F11/273, G01R31/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [2002/29] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Chipkartenbasierendes Prüfverfahren und Vorrichtung | [1999/48] | English: | IC card-based test apparatus and method | [1999/48] | French: | Méthode et appareil de test fondé sur une carte à circuit intégré | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 15.09.2006 | ES | 25.09.2006 | [2008/21] |
Former [2007/21] | ES | 25.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19542262 (FISCHER COMPUTERSYSTEME GMBH & [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]FR2737794 (CANTU AUGUSTO GIUSEPPE LUCIO [FR]) [A] 1-3,9* page 1, line 15 - line 39; figure 2 * |