EP0949596 - Method and system to perform electronic value exchange and settlement among heterogeneous payment schemes with heterogeneous currencies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 399 Park Avenue New York New York 10043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 399 Park Avenue New York, New York 10043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golvin, Charles 2762 McConnell Drive Los Angeles CA 90064 / US | 02 /
Katis, Thomas 1770 Green St., Apt 203 San Francisco, CA 94123 / US | [2000/13] |
Former [1999/41] | 01 /
Golvin, Charles 2762 McConnell Drive Los Angeles CA 90064 / US | ||
02 /
Katis, Thomas 150 W.56th St., Apt.3702 New York NY 10019 / US | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars E., et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Johansson, Lars E., et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99200970.4 | 30.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | US19980079801P | 30.03.1998 Original published format: US 79801 P | US19990280090P | 29.03.1999 Original published format: US 280090 P | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949596 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949596 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00, G07F7/08, G06F17/60 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
G06Q20/06 (EP);
G06Q20/29 (EP);
G06Q20/381 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/39] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Durchführen von elektronischem Wertaustausch und Ausgleich zwischen heterogenen Bezahlungssystemen mit verschiedenartigen Währungen | [1999/41] | English: | Method and system to perform electronic value exchange and settlement among heterogeneous payment schemes with heterogeneous currencies | [1999/41] | French: | Méthode et système pour effectuer l'échange et le réglement électronique de valeurs entre systèmes de paiement hétérogènes avec monnaies différentes | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.08.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |